Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02462
Date Filed2021-09-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted FOIA requests to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys and the Civil Rights Division of the Department of Justice for records concerning the investigation of the death of Ashli Babbitt, who was killed while trying to break into the Capitol Building on Jan 6, 2021. The components acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from either component, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-201COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8744251) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Justice)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-202LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-21Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) (Entered: 09/21/2021)
2021-09-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/21/2021)
2021-09-304RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/24/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/24/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2021)
2021-09-305RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/30/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2021)
2021-09-306RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/30/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar