Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJustice Action Center et al v. U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2021cv07592
Date Filed2021-09-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John F. Walter
PlaintiffJustice Action Center
PlaintiffImmigrant Defenders Law Center
Case DescriptionJustice Action Center and Immigrant Defenders Law Center submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning the processing of minor children at the southern border. JAC and IDLC requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request. The agencies provided a conditional grant to the fee waiver request except for Customs and Border Protection, which denied the fee waiver request. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, JAC and IDLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantU.S. Dept. of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
DefendantU.S Office of Refugee Resettlement
DefendantU.S. Dept. of Health and Human Services
DefendantU.S. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [14]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-221COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32031101 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Immigrant Defendant Defenders Law Center, Justice Action Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Attorney Bradley S Phillips added to party Immigrant Defendant Defenders Law Center(pty:pla), Attorney Bradley S Phillips added to party Justice Action Center(pty:pla))(Phillips, Bradley) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-222CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Immigrant Defendant Defenders Law Center, Justice Action Center. (Phillips, Bradley) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-223NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Immigrant Defendant Defenders Law Center, Justice Action Center, identifying none. (Phillips, Bradley) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-224Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs Immigrant Defendant Defenders Law Center, Justice Action Center. (Phillips, Bradley) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-236NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil) (Entered: 09/23/2021)
2021-09-237NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/23/2021)
2021-09-238Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 09/23/2021)
2021-09-239NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 09/23/2021)
2021-09-2310Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs Immigrant Defendant Defenders Law Center, Justice Action Center. (Phillips, Bradley) (Entered: 09/23/2021)
2021-09-2411STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
2021-09-241260 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant U.S. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Dept. of Health and Human Services, U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (iv) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
2021-10-1413PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Justice Action Center, upon Defendant U.S. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention served on 9/24/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; U.S Office of Refugee Resettlement served on 9/24/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 9/24/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; U.S. Dept. of Health and Human Services served on 9/24/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security served on 9/24/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 9/24/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to [unsigned]. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to various agencies. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Phillips, Bradley) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-1514MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. counsel is ordered to show cause in writing by October 18, 2021 why theCourt should not impose sanctions in the amount of $750.00 for violating the Court's Standing Order. No oral argument on this matter will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the imposition of sanctions. In addition, counsel shall file the required Declaration on or before October 18, 2021. Response to Order to Show C ause due by 10/18/2021. (et) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-1815RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Justice Action Centerto Order to Show Cause,,, 14 (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Phillips, Bradley) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-1816DECLARATION of Bradley S. Phillips (Lead Trial Counsel) filed by Plaintiffs Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Justice Action Center. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Phillips, Bradley) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar