Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY v. SOUTH DAKOTA NATIONAL GUARD et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02476
Date Filed2021-09-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffCENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Public Integrity submitted a FOIA request to the South Dakota National Guard and the Department of Defense for records concerning a grant from Willis and Reba Johnson to the South Dakota National Guard. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The SDNG told the Center of Public Integrity that it would not respond to the request because it was not subject to FOIA. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CPI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantSOUTH DAKOTA NATIONAL GUARD
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-221COMPLAINT against SOUTH DAKOTA NATIONAL GUARD, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8749232) filed by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit SDNG FOIA Response, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons SDNG, # 4 Summons DOD, # 5 Summons USAtty, # 6 Summons AttyGen)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEGRITY (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-22Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-233STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/23/2021. (lctnm2) (Entered: 09/23/2021)
2021-09-234SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to SOUTH DAKOTA NATIONAL GUARD, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/23/2021)
2021-09-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/23/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/23/2021. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
2021-10-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SOUTH DAKOTA NATIONAL GUARD served on 9/30/2021; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 9/30/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/27/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Postal Return Receipt - SDNG, # 2 Exhibit Postal Return Receipt - DoD, # 3 Exhibit Postal Return Receipt - AttyGen)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
2021-10-197NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Alexandra Heiman on behalf of All Defendants (Heiman, Julia) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-198Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by SOUTH DAKOTA NATIONAL GUARD, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heiman, Julia) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar