Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02482
Date Filed2021-09-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Army and the South Dakota National Guard for records concerning outside donations to fund sending SDNG troops to the southern border. CREW also requested a fee waiver, the agency acknowledged receipt of the request but told CREW that since it was a hybrid agency with both federal and state functions it would respond. CREW then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Agency - Federal, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
DefendantSOUTH DAKOTA NATIONAL GUARD
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-221COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8751551) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons Army, # 5 Summons South Dakota National Guard)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-23Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (znmg) (Entered: 09/23/2021)
2021-09-233SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 09/23/2021)
2021-09-244STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 24, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
2021-10-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/30/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/30/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SOUTH DAKOTA NATIONAL GUARD served on 9/28/2021; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY served on 9/30/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/1/21. (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 10/04/2021)
2021-10-166NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica B. Colsia on behalf of SOUTH DAKOTA NATIONAL GUARD, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Colsia, Jessica) (Entered: 10/16/2021)
2021-10-187First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SOUTH DAKOTA NATIONAL GUARD, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Colsia, Jessica) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-18MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' 7 First Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's 1 Complaint on or before December 1, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 18, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/1/2021, (zjch, ) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-208AMENDED COMPLAINT against SOUTH DAKOTA NATIONAL GUARD, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Redline comparison of original and amended pleading)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 10/20/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar