Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02486
Date Filed2021-09-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Energy for records concerning communications to, from, or pertaining to Kelly Speakes-Backman, head of the agency's Office of Energy Efficiency and Renewable Energy. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-231COMPLAINT against PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8752389) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons (Proposed to Defendant, US Attorney, and US Attorney General))(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 09/23/2021)
2021-09-23Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 09/23/2021)
2021-09-242SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
2021-10-203NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Horner, Christopher) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/21/2021) (rj). Modified on 10/21/2021 to flatten pdf (rj). (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-10-254NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 10/25/2021)
2021-11-055Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 11/05/2021)
2021-11-05MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must file an answer to the complaint or otherwise respond by November 19, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/05/2021. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/05/2021)
2021-11-196ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY.(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2021-11-227ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before December 20, 2021. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/22/2021. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar