Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSPEAKING TRUTH TO POWER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DistrictEastern District of Pennsylvania
CityPhiladelphia
Case Number2:2021cv04217
Date Filed2021-09-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON
PlaintiffSPEAKING TRUTH TO POWER
Case DescriptionSpeaking Truth to Power submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Commerce for records concerning communications related to the government's use of the Solar Winds Orion System. STTP also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted STTP's request for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency located responsive records but withheld some Exemption 4 (commercial and confidential), Exemption 5 (privileges), and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). The agency continued to disclose records but in interim responses but after hearing nothing further from the agency, STTP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-241COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15430969.), filed by SPEAKING TRUTH TO POWER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Designation Form)(ZACHER, JULES) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
2021-09-27Summons Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 9/27/21. SUMMONS AS TO AUSA E-MAILED ON 9/27/21. (bw, ) (Entered: 09/27/2021)
2021-10-042Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (JL ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar