Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMartinez v. Administrative Office of the United States Courts
DistrictDistrict of Arizona
CityTucson Division
Case Number4:2021cv00371
Date Filed2021-09-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Scott H Rash
PlaintiffJose Martinez
Case DescriptionChase Martinez requested records from the Administrative Office for U.S. Courts for records concerning his trial. This is not a FOIA claim because the judiciary is not subject to FOIA.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantAdministrative Office of the United States Courts named as Administrative Office of US Courts
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-201PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Jose Martinez. (6 pages) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Envelope)(MCO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2021: # 3 Complaint with case number added) (MCO). (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-202NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MCO) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-293ORDERED: Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 9/29/2021. (ARC) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
2021-10-184Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number TUC033565. PAID IN FULL. (SCA) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar