Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLuthmann v. The Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityFt. Myers
Case Number2:2021cv00716
Date Filed2021-09-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John E. Steele
PlaintiffRichard Luthmann
Case DescriptionRichard Luthman submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning himself. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request. The FBI denied Luthman's request under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Luthman filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Luthman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantThe Federal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-241COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against The Federal Bureau of Investigation filed by Richard Luthmann. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2021: # 10 Mailing Envelope) (jmc). (Entered: 09/27/2021)
2021-09-242MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Richard Luthmann. (jmc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (Entered: 09/27/2021)
2021-09-243DECLARATION in support of 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Richard Luthmann. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(jmc) (Entered: 09/27/2021)
2021-09-244PROPOSED summons to be issued by Richard Luthmann. (jmc) (Entered: 09/27/2021)
2021-09-285CIVIL Action Order, Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/28/2021. (jmc) (Entered: 09/28/2021)
2021-09-286NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (jmc) (Entered: 09/28/2021)
2021-10-017ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 10/1/2021. (SM) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
2021-10-158DECLARATION of MAILING by Richard Luthmann. (jmc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2021: # 1 Mailing Envelope) (jmc). (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-159SUMMONS issued as to The Federal Bureau of Investigation by Richard Luthmann. (jmc) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar