Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCruz v. United States of America
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2021cv05007
Date Filed2021-09-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Harry D. Leinenweber
PlaintiffJerico Matias Cruz
Case DescriptionJerico Cruz submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning himself. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Cruz filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States of America
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-221RECEIVED Complaint and Zero copies by Jerico Matias Cruz. (Exhibits) (daj, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-222CIVIL Cover Sheet (daj, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-223APPLICATION by Plaintiff Jerico Matias Cruz for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (daj, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-224PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Jerico Matias Cruz (daj, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-22CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-10-047ORDER: Plaintiff Cruz's motion to proceed in forma pauperis 3 is granted. The clerk shall issue thesummons forthwith. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/4/2021: Mailed notice(daj, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)
2021-10-048COMPLAINT filed by Jerico Matias Cruz. (Exhibits) (daj, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)
2021-10-04SUMMONS Issued along with one USM 285 form, certified copy of order dated 10/04/2021 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)
2021-10-069RETURN of Service of USM 285 returned executed on 10/06/2021 as to United States of America (daj, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)
2021-10-0610RETURN of Service of USM 285 returned executed on 10/06/2021 as to U.S. Attorney (daj, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)
2021-10-0611RETURN of Service of USM 285 returned executed on 10/06/2021 as to U.S. Attorney General (daj, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar