Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02534
Date Filed2021-09-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning the Secretary's visitor's logs. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-291COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8766576) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (FOIA Request), # 2 Summons Proposed to AG, USAO, and Agency Counsel, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
2021-09-30Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmg) (Entered: 09/30/2021)
2021-09-302SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 09/30/2021)
2021-09-303STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/30/2021. (lctnm2) (Entered: 09/30/2021)
2021-10-204NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Horner, Christopher) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/21/2021) (rj). Modified on 10/21/2021 to flatten pdf (rj). (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-11-155NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of All Defendants (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
2021-11-156ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
2021-11-16MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before December 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/16/2021. (lctnm2) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
2021-11-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar