Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNational Immigrant Justice Center v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2021cv05151
Date Filed2021-09-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Joan H. Lefkow
PlaintiffNational Immigrant Justice Center
Case DescriptionThe National Immigrant Justice Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the implementation of Section 1325 and Section 1326 prosecutions under Operation Sunshine. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told NIJC that it could find no records. NIJC filed an administrative appeal, but the agency still contended it could find no records. NIJC then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-291COMPLAINT filed by National Immigrant Justice Center; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18718247. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fleming, Mark) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
2021-09-29CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (crl, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
2021-09-302MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 12/15/2021 at 9:30 a.m. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (877) 402-9753 and the access code is 1564342. Counsel of record will receive an email the day before the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (ags) (Entered: 09/30/2021)
2021-09-303ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by Mark M. Fleming (Fleming, Mark) (Entered: 09/30/2021)
2021-10-08SUMMONS Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (ak, ) (Entered: 10/08/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar