Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02644
Date Filed2021-10-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications and calendars for several senior DOJ officials at the end of the Trump administration. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency concerning any of its requests, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-081COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8789875) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to US Attorney's Office, # 3 Summons as to Attorney General, # 4 Summons as to US Department of Justice)(Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 10/08/2021)
2021-10-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 10/08/2021)
2021-10-12Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (znmg) (Entered: 10/12/2021)
2021-10-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 10/12/2021)
2021-11-104RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/25/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/25/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/22/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/21/2021.) (Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-195NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Richer on behalf of All Defendants (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2021-11-196ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Richer, Amber) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2021-11-22MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by December 2, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/22/2021. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/2/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-12-027Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
2021-12-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 7 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by January 7, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/2/2021. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
2021-12-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2022. (znbn) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
2022-01-078Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 01/07/2022)
2022-01-08MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 8 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by February 25, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/8/2022. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/08/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar