Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDolcefino Communications LLC d/b/a Dolcefino Consulting v. United States Department Of Housing And Urban Development
DistrictSouthern District of Texas
CityHouston
Case Number4:2021cv03326
Date Filed2021-10-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Lee H Rosenthal
PlaintiffDolcefino Communications LLC
doing business as Dolcefino Consulting
Case DescriptionDolcefino Communications submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning communications between two named employees in the Houston field office with the Houston Housing Authority. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Dolcefino Communications filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department Of Housing And Urban Development
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-111COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27173215) filed by Dolcefino Communications LLC d/b/a Dolcefino Consulting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Diamant, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2021)
2021-10-122ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 12/17/2021 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: # 1 Attachments) Parties notified.(RachelWillborgadi, 4) (Entered: 10/12/2021)
2021-10-143Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Diamant, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-154Summons Issued as to United States Department Of Housing And Urban Development. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-11-165Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline and the Initial Conference by United States Department Of Housing And Urban Development, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/7/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cravens, Annalisa) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar