Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02676
Date Filed2021-10-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed reporter Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Criminal Division of the Department of Justice for records concerning the album Once Upon a Time by the Wu Tang Clan. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Leopold that the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys had responsive records. Leopold then sent a FOIA request to EOUSA. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. He also filed an administrative appeal of the Criminal Division's claim that it had no records. The Criminal Division denied the appeal. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8794807) filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-8, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2021)
2021-10-122NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2021)
2021-10-123LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED, INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2021)
2021-10-14Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-154SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-185ERRATA by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD re 1 Complaint filed by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Complaint)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-11-226NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-227ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-23MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that, on or before December 29, 2021, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear via Zoom for an Initial Scheduling Conference on January 6, 2021, at 2:30 p.m., before Judge Randolph D. Moss. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will provide the Zoom login information prior to the conference. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/23/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-11-288RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/9/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2021)
2021-11-289RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/09/2021. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2021)
2021-11-2810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/9/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/9/2021. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/28/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar