Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTorres v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv08427
Date Filed2021-10-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Laura Taylor Swain
PlaintiffWilfredo Torres
Case DescriptionWilfredo Torres submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice concerning an FBI raid on his apartment. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Torres filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [4]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-121REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Wilfredo Torres. (sac) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-122COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice. Document filed by Wilfredo Torres. (sac) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-12Case Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-13NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-183ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/18/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-205LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from W. Torres, dated October 2021 re: This is another letter about corruption in your court. At about noon today, I went to the Court's record room on the third floor to make a one-page copy related to the above case which coincidentally deals with corruption, and crimes by U.S. Judge Ronnie Abrams and her husband, Greg Andres. I was given a form and instructions to pay fifty cents at the cashier located on the second floor of the building etc. I left the Court without the document that I needed. Document filed by Wilfredo Torres.(sc) (Entered: 10/25/2021)
2021-10-254ORDER TO AMEND: Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within thirty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 21-CV-8427 (LTS). An Amended Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/25/2021) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 10/25/2021)
2021-10-25Mailed a copy of 4 Order 30 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to Wilfredo Torres at 470 Second Avenue, Apt. 2A, New York, NY 10016. (dsh) (Entered: 10/25/2021)
2021-11-236AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice, re: amending 2 Complaint with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Wilfredo Torres. Related document: 2 Complaint.(sc) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar