Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02680
Date Filed2021-10-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffPROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Project on Government Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Treasury for records concerning interactions between former Treasury Secretary Steven Mnuchin and five individuals who worked at four named companies from February 2017 to January 2021. POGO also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, POGO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-131COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8796123) filed by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons U.S. Dep't of Treasury, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Related Case Form)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-132NOTICE by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit C to Complaint)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-133NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.. Case related to Case No. 21-1359. (zsb) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-14Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-154SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-215LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 10/21/2021)
2021-11-246ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/24/2021)
2021-11-29MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by December 13, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/29/2021. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-11-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/13/2021. (nbn) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar