Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleZaid v. Department of Justice
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityGreenbelt
Case Number8:2021cv02625
Date Filed2021-10-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Theodore D. Chuang
PlaintiffMark Zaid
Case DescriptionMark Zaid submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning fourteen categories of records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency then denied all fourteen categories under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation. Zaid filed an administrative appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Zaid filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-131COMPLAINT against Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9547179.), filed by MARK ZAID. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOJ, # 3 Summons USAG, # 4 Summons USAMD)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-132MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Using Counsel's Address in Violation of LCVR 102.2(a) by MARK ZAID (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Moss Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-143Summons Issued 60 days as to Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-144NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Mark Zaid or counsel for Mark Zaid are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded here . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded here , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 10/28/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-145Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 10/14/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-296ORDER directing Mark Zaid to show cause for failure to comply with Standing Order 2019-07 . Show Cause Hearing set for 11/19/2021 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Mark Zaid files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 10/29/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/29/2021)
2021-10-298PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: 6 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 10/29/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/29/2021)
2021-10-29Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/29/2021)
2021-11-019SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Zaid. Department of Justice served on 10/20/2021, answer due 11/10/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-0110SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Zaid. Department of Justice served on 10/19/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt USADM)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-0111CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/1/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-0212ORDER granting 2 Motion for leave to File Complaint Using Counsel's Address. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/2/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-1713Consent Request for Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consolidation Motion - 1130 Case)(Lazerow, Alan) (Entered: 11/17/2021)
2021-12-0114ORDER granting (14) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 8:21-cv-01130-GJH. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 12/1/2021. Associated Cases: 8:21-cv-02625-TDC(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
2021-12-0115THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (21-1130-GJH). (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar