Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInformed Consent Action Network v. National Institutes of Health
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CityAustin
Case Number1:2021cv00915
Date Filed2021-10-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robert Pitman
PlaintiffInformed Consent Action Network
Case DescriptionInformed Consent Action Network submitted two FOIA requests to the National Institute of Health for records concerning EcoHealth or that contained the term Daszak. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, ICAN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Institutes of Health
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-131COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15326278). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A.1, # 2 Exhibit A.2, # 3 Exhibit B.1, # 4 Exhibit B.2, # 5 Exhibit C.1, # 6 Exhibit C.2, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Supplement Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Siri, Aaron) (Attachment 7 replaced and flattened on 10/13/2021) (cj). (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-132REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 10/13/2021) (cj). (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-13Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-13If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-133Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Gabrielle G. Palmer and Ursula Smith re: non-admitted status. (cj) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-134Summons Issued as to National Institutes of Health. (cj) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-205MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aaron Siri on behalf of Gabrielle G. Palmer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15355485) by on behalf of Informed Consent Action Network. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-10-206MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aaron Siri on behalf of Ursula M. Smith ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15355850) by on behalf of Informed Consent Action Network. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-10-22Text Order GRANTING 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Gabrielle G. Palmer. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) (Entered: 10/22/2021)
2021-10-22Text Order GRANTING 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Ursula M. Smith. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) (Entered: 10/22/2021)
2021-10-277SUMMONS Returned Executed by Informed Consent Action Network. National Institutes of Health served on 10/19/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Defendant, # 2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service on Civil Process Clerk, # 3 Exhibit C - Proof of Service on Attorney General of USA)(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-11-108MOTION for Status Conference by Informed Consent Action Network. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Palmer, Gabrielle) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-169NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Arthur Parnham, Jr on behalf of National Institutes of Health. Attorney Thomas Arthur Parnham, Jr added to party National Institutes of Health(pty:dft) (Parnham, Thomas) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
2021-11-1610Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by National Institutes of Health, re 8 MOTION for Status Conference filed by Plaintiff Informed Consent Action Network (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parnham, Thomas) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
2021-11-1711REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Informed Consent Action Network, re 8 MOTION for Status Conference filed by Plaintiff Informed Consent Action Network (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 11/17/2021)
2021-11-2212ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by National Institutes of Health.(Parnham, Thomas) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar