Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-10-14 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8798581) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons DOJ, # 4 Summons US Attorney)(Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 10/14/2021) |
2021-10-14 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 10/14/2021) |
2021-10-14 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 10/14/2021) |
2021-10-15 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/18/2021) (adh, ). (Entered: 10/15/2021) |
2021-10-26 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/26/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/25/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/26/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/26/21. (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 10/26/2021) |
2021-11-19 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Richer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 11/19/2021) |
2021-11-19 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Richer, Amber) (Entered: 11/19/2021) |
2021-11-22 | 7 | ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before December 20, 2021. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/22/2021. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/22/2021) |
2021-12-17 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richer, Amber) (Entered: 12/17/2021) |
2021-12-23 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 8 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by February 4, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/23/2021. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/23/2021) |
2022-02-04 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richer, Amber) (Entered: 02/04/2022) |
2022-02-04 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 9 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by March 4, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/04/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/04/2022) |
2022-03-04 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richer, Amber) (Entered: 03/04/2022) |
2022-03-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 10 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by April 8, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/07/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/07/2022) |
2022-04-08 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richer, Amber) (Entered: 04/08/2022) |
2022-04-11 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 11 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by May 27, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 04/11/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/11/2022) |
2022-05-27 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richer, Amber) (Entered: 05/27/2022) |
2022-05-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 12 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by June 30, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/27/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/27/2022) |
2022-06-30 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richer, Amber) (Entered: 06/30/2022) |
2022-06-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 13 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by July 29, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 06/30/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/30/2022) |
2022-07-20 | 14 | NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Adanma Iheanachor on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Iheanachor, Laura) (Entered: 07/20/2022) |
2022-07-29 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richer, Amber) (Entered: 07/29/2022) |
2022-08-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 15 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by August 24, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/01/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 08/01/2022) |
2022-08-23 | 16 | STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Richer, Amber) (Entered: 08/23/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |