Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleU.S. Right to Know v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2021cv08056
Date Filed2021-10-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson
PlaintiffU.S. Right to Know a California Non-Profit Corporation
Case DescriptionU.S. Right to Know submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records containing identified search terms that were exchanged between a specific HHS employee and other entities. U.S. Right to Know also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, U.S. Right to Know filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantU.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-141COMPLAINT against U.S. Right to Know ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16497906.). Filed byU.S. Right to Know. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-142Certificate of Interested Entities by U.S. Right to Know (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-143Proposed Summons. (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-144Proposed Summons. (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-145Proposed Summons. (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-146Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/28/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-147EXHIBITS re 1 Complaint Exhibit A (FOIA Request) filed byU.S. Right to Know. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-158Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2022 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-159Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 U.S. Attorney, # 2 U.S. Attorney General)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-11-0110CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Right to Know (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-0111CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Right to Know (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-0112CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Right to Know (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-0913STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Responsive Pleading Deadline filed by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Savith Iyengar)(Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 11/9/2021) (Entered: 11/09/2021)
2021-11-0914ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 13 Stipulation to continue time for defendant to respond to complaint. Extension to respond by: 12/30/2021. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021) (Entered: 11/09/2021)
2021-11-1615MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16633028.) filed by U.S. Right to Know. (Snyder, Daniel) (Filed on 11/16/2021) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
2021-11-1716ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Daniel Snyder. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021) (Entered: 11/17/2021)
2021-11-2317CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-11-2318CLERKS NOTICE Re Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge was due on 10/28/2021. It was not received by the Court. Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/30/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-11-2319CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Right to Know.. (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar