Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleU.S. Right to Know-v-U.S. Agency for International Aid
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2021cv08058
Date Filed2021-10-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Sallie Kim
PlaintiffU.S. Right to Know
Case DescriptionU.S. Right to Know submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Agency for International Development for records concerning USAID grants to EcoHealth Alliance involving research in China on bat-associated pathogens. U.S. Right to Know also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, U.S. Right to Know filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Agency for International Aid
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-141COMPLAINT against U.S. Agency for International Aid ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16498270.). Filed byU.S. Right to Know. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (FOIA Request), # 2 Exhibit B (Revised FOIA Request), # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 10/14/2021) Modified on 10/15/2021 (msrS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-142Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Right to Know (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-143Proposed Summons. (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-144Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/28/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2021) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-155Erroneous Entry--Please Ignore--See Docket Entry 7 For Corrected Document Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021) Modified on 10/15/2021 (msrS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-156Summons Issued as to U.S. Agency for International Aid. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-157Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2021) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-298CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/12/2021 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2021. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2021) (Entered: 10/29/2021)
2021-11-019CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 6 Summons U.S. Agency for International (Attorney General's Office) Aid by U.S. Right to Know (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 11/1/2021) Modified on 11/2/2021 (msr, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/2/2021 (msr, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-0110CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 6 Summons U.S. Agency for International Aid by U.S. Right to Know (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 11/1/2021) Modified on 11/2/2021 (msr, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-0111CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 6 Summons U.S. Agency for International Aid (U.S. Attorney's Office) by U.S. Right to Know (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 11/1/2021) Modified on 11/2/2021 (msr, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-0312CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Right to Know.. (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)
2021-11-0913STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Responsive Pleading Deadline filed by U.S. Agency for International Aid. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Savith Iyengar)(Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 11/9/2021) (Entered: 11/09/2021)
2021-11-0914ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 13 Stipulation to Continue Responsive Pleading Deadline. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021) (Entered: 11/09/2021)
2021-11-0915CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/23/2021 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/23/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021) (Entered: 11/09/2021)
2021-11-1616Erroneous Entry Motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16632328.) filed by U.S. Right to Know. (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 11/16/2021) Modified on 11/16/2021 (hdj, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/17/2021 (msr, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/17/2021 (msr, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/16/2021)
2021-11-1617Erroneous Entry MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16632328.) Filing fee previously paid on November 16, 2021 filed by U.S. Right to Know. (Snyder, Daniel) (Filed on 11/16/2021) Modified on 11/17/2021 (msr, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/17/2021 (msr, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/16/2021)
2021-11-1618Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16632328.) Filing fee previously paid on November 16, 2021 filed by U.S. Right to Know. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Snyder, Daniel) (Filed on 11/16/2021) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
2021-11-1819ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel Snyder. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2021) (Entered: 11/18/2021)
2021-11-2320CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Agency for International Aid.. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-11-2321CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Right to Know.. (Doughty, Rachel) (Filed on 11/23/2021) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar