Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. SECRET SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02716
Date Filed2021-10-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to U.S. Secret Service for records concerning preparations for the Jan. 6, 2021, Trump rally in front of the White House that resulted in the attack on the Capitol. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. SECRET SERVICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8802309) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to USAO, # 3 Summons as to AG, # 4 Summons as USSS, # 5 Summons as to DHS)(Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-18Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-183SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-194STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/19/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/27/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/26/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/25/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 10/25/2021; U.S. SECRET SERVICE served on 10/25/2021 (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 10/29/2021)
2021-11-246ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE.(Zee, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar