Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDENNEKAMP v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02727
Date Filed2021-10-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffGERT-JAN DENNEKAMP
Case DescriptionGert-Jan Dennekamp, a Dutch citizen, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning the agency's investigation of the shooting down of the Malaysia Airlines' Flight MH17 over Ukraine in July 2014. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after nothing further from the agency, Dennekamp filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-151COMPLAINT Gert-Jan Dennekamp against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8802743) filed by GERT-JAN DENNEKAMP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Quaranto, Lance) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-18Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-182SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-11-223NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-224ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-23MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by December 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/23/2021. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-11-305NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stotter on behalf of GERT-JAN DENNEKAMP (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar