Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02728
Date Filed2021-10-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted two FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning communications received by the FBI about the plans for the Jan. 6, 2021, Trump rally that resulted in an attack on the Capitol. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
935 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20535
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-151COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8802850) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to USAO, # 3 Summons as to AG, # 4 Summons as to FBI, # 5 Summons as to DOJ)(Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-18Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-183SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-194ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/18/2021. (DM) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/25/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/24/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/25/21., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 10/25/2021; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/25/2021 (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-11-236NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Riess on behalf of All Defendants (Riess, Daniel) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-11-237Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riess, Daniel) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-11-23MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendants' 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants ask for an extension of time to December 3, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint. This is Defendants' first such request, and Plaintiff does not oppose the Motion. Counsel for Defendants states that he was assigned this week to handle the present case,... and [that] [he] will be absent from the office this week because of the Thanksgiving holiday. Mot. at 1, ECF No. 7. Accordingly, and upon good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED . It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint on or before December 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/23/2021. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-11-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/3/2021. (kt) (Entered: 11/24/2021)
2021-12-038ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Riess, Daniel) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar