Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCGFNS INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGATION SERVICES
DistrictEastern District of Pennsylvania
CityPhiladelphia
Case Number2:2021cv04529
Date Filed2021-10-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG
PlaintiffCGFNS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Case DescriptionCGFNS International submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning an application for a Form I-905. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied it because it pertained to a specific person, citing Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). CGFNS International filed an administrative appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CGFNS International filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-151COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15480359.), filed by CGFNS INTERNATIONAL, INC..(RALEIGH, KENNETH) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-152NOTICE by CGFNS INTERNATIONAL, INC. re 1 Complaint (Attorney) CIVIL COVER SHEET (RALEIGH, KENNETH) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-153NOTICE by CGFNS INTERNATIONAL, INC. Corporate Disclosure Form (RALEIGH, KENNETH) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-15Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file Designation Form in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (nd, ) (Entered: 10/16/2021)
2021-10-15Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CGFNS INTERNATIONAL, INC. *FOR PDF SEE DOC. 3 * (lisad, ) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-18Summons Issued as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/18/21. SUMMON AS TO AUSA E-MAILED ON 10/18/21. (bw, ) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-18FOIA Summons Issued as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 10/18/2021. (sg, ) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-184EXHIBIT DESIGNATION FORM by CGFNS INTERNATIONAL, INC... (RALEIGH, KENNETH) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-185MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Carl W. Hampe ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15483756.) filed by CGFNS INTERNATIONAL, INC..Certificate of Service.(RALEIGH, KENNETH) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-20612(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-10-207ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR CARL WALTER HAMPE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/20/2021.10/21/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)
2021-10-268Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (sg, ) (Entered: 10/26/2021)
2021-10-279EXHIBIT to COMPLAINT [Doc. 1] by CGFNS INTERNATIONAL, INC... (RALEIGH, KENNETH) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-11-0310CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CGFNS INTERNATIONAL, INC. re 1 Complaint (Attorney) on U.S. Attorney General (RALEIGH, KENNETH) (Entered: 11/03/2021)
2021-11-0311CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CGFNS INTERNATIONAL, INC. re 1 Complaint (Attorney) on U.S. Attorney for EDPA (RALEIGH, KENNETH) (Entered: 11/03/2021)
2021-11-0312CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CGFNS INTERNATIONAL, INC. re 11 Certificate of Service on USCIS (RALEIGH, KENNETH) (Entered: 11/03/2021)
2021-11-1613STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED AN ADDITIONAL THIRTY (30) DAYS, UNTIL DECEMBER 20, 2021.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/16/2021. 11/17/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 11/17/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar