Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCrystal Nasha Rodgers v. Louis DeJoy et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2021cv08190
Date Filed2021-10-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha
PlaintiffCrystal Nasha Rodgers
Case DescriptionCrystal Nasha Rodgers submitted FOIA requests to the U.S. Postal Service for records concerning her EEOC complaint. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Rodgers filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search

DefendantLouis DeJoy in official capacity
DefendantPostmaster General
DefendantUnited States Postal Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-151COMPLAINT against Defendants Louis DeJoy, Postmaster General, United States Postal Service.Case assigned to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Crystal Nasha Rodgers. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-152CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Crystal Nasha Rodgers, (lh) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-153REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Crystal Nasha Rodgers. (lh) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-194NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-195NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-196Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-207ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed in Forma pauperis is hereby GRANTED. Granting 3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (es) (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-10-218INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 10/21/2021)
2021-10-25960 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 as to defendants Louis DeJoy, Postmaster General, United States Postal Service. (lc) (Entered: 10/25/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar