Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFroehlich v. Transportation Security Administration et al
DistrictDistrict of Rhode Island
CityProvidence
Case Number1:2021cv00417
Date Filed2021-10-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.
PlaintiffMatthew Froehlich
Case DescriptionMatthew Froelich submitted a FOIA request to the Transportation Security Administration for records concerning video taken of his missing laptop at the airport. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Froelich filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantTransportation Security Administration
DefendantRhode Island Airport Corporation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-181COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00 receipt number 14670025772 ), filed by Matthew Froehlich. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-182CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-193Summons Request filed by Matthew Froehlich. (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-194Summons Request filed by Matthew Froehlich. (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-195Summons Issued as to Transportation Security Administration. (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-196Summons Issued as to Rhode Island Airport Corporation. (DaCruz, Kayla) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-12-027First MOTION for an Extension of Time filed by Transportation Security Administration. Responses due by 12/16/2021. (Kane, Leslie) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
2021-12-03TEXT ORDER granting 7 First MOTION for an Extension of Time. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/3/2021. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
2021-12-03Reset Deadlines: Transportation Security Administration answer due 1/17/2022. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar