Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN FRIENDS SERVICE COMMITTEE v. UNITED STATES AIR FORCE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02774
Date Filed2021-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN FRIENDS SERVICE COMMITTEE
Case DescriptionWe Count submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Air Force and the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the detention center at the old Homestead Air Force Base, which had previously been a Superfund site. We Count also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The Air Force initially to We Count that had no records but then agreed to conduct a search. After hearing nothing further from either agency, We Count filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES AIR FORCE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-191COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8808316) filed by AMERICAN FRIENDS SERVICE COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons Summons, # 10 Summons Summons, # 11 Summons Summons)(Helle, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN FRIENDS SERVICE COMMITTEE (Helle, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-193MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dominique Burkhardt, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8809061. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN FRIENDS SERVICE COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Helle, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-19Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-194SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice 3 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Dominique Burkhardt is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to to LCvR 83.6(a)/LCrR 44.5(a). Click for Instructions . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/20/2021 . (lcrdm2) (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-10-205STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/20/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-10-276NOTICE of Appearance by Dominique Burkhardt on behalf of AMERICAN FRIENDS SERVICE COMMITTEE (Burkhardt, Dominique) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-11-047RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/27/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/26/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Burkhardt, Dominique) (Entered: 11/04/2021)
2021-11-238NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Duffey on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-11-269Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, with proposed order by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 11/26/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar