Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOLL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02777
Date Filed2021-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffSTEVE COLL
Case DescriptionJournalist Steve Coll submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Defense for records concerning the Saddam Hussein Regime Conflict Records Research Center. Coll also requested a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Coll filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-191COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8809727) filed by STEVE COLL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-19Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-192SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-11-023RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/29/21., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/1/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/1/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 10/28/2021 (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-224NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-225Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-22MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted, and that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before December 22, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/22/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-226NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Alexander Marshall on behalf of STEVE COLL (Marshall, Adam) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/22/2021, (tj) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-12-027NOTICE of Appearance by Gunita Singh on behalf of STEVE COLL (Singh, Gunita) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar