Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOLLIER v. KENDALL
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02781
Date Filed2021-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffDOMINIQUE COLLIER Captain
DefendantFRANK KENDALL Honorable, Secretary of the Air Force
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-191SEALED MOTION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachment: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(zeg) (Entered: 10/21/2021)
2021-10-192SEALED ORDER re 1 SEALED MOTION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.).(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 10/19/2021.(eg) (Entered: 10/21/2021)
2021-10-193ORDER granting in part 1 Sealed Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 10/19/2021. (eg) (Entered: 10/21/2021)
2021-10-194SEALED COMPLAINT filed by DOMINIQUE COLLIER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(zeg) (Entered: 10/21/2021)
2021-10-215SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FRANK KENDALL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 10/21/2021)
2021-10-266REDACTED DOCUMENT- Redacted Complaint to 4 Sealed Document by DOMINIQUE COLLIER. (Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 10/26/2021)
2021-10-26Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number: ADCDC-8824535. (eg) (Entered: 11/04/2021)
2021-11-297NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Tilghman, II on behalf of FRANK KENDALL (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-11-298Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by FRANK KENDALL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-12-01MINUTE ORDER granting the Defendant's 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Secretary shall file his response to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint on or before January 3, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/1/21. (lctnm1) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
2021-12-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 1/3/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar