Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGoodman v. Federal Bureau Of Investigation
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv08588
Date Filed2021-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Vernon S. Broderick
PlaintiffRyan Goodman as Co-Editor-in-Chief of Just Security
Case DescriptionRyan Goodman, editor of Just Security, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning communications between the FBI and social media companies before Jan. 6, 2021. Goodman's request also included a list of search terms. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but told Goodman that it was too broad to search. Goodman filed an administrative appeal. The agency upheld its denial. Goodman then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau Of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [8]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-191COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25217590)Document filed by Ryan Goodman, as Co-Editor-in-Chief of Just Security. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D).(Linhorst, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-192CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Linhorst, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-193REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ryan Goodman, as Co-Editor-in-Chief of Just Security..(Linhorst, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-10-20***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Linhorst. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ryan Goodman, as Co-Editor-in-Chief of Just Security. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was modified to add party text separately. (jgo) (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-10-20CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(jgo) (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-10-20Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (jgo) (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-10-20Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-10-204ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(jgo) (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-10-215AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). Federal Bureau Of Investigation served on 10/20/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Ryan Goodman..(Linhorst, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2021)
2021-11-196NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Waglow Teleanu on behalf of Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2021-11-197ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2021-11-228ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, in light of the public health crisis, the Court will not be holding an initial pretrial conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by December 3, 2021, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/22/2021) (kv) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-12-039JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Michael Linhorst and Natasha W. Teleanu dated December 3, 2021 re: submission in lieu of initial conference. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar