Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02797
Date Filed2021-10-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffPROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Project on Government Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning a whistleblower's allegations of improprieties in the presidential audit process. POGO also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency granted POGO's request for expedited processing but told POGO its request was too broad to search. After hearing nothing further from the agency, POGO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-211COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8815494) filed by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Dep't of Treasury, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 10/21/2021)
2021-10-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 10/21/2021)
2021-10-21Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)
2021-10-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)
2021-10-214STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 21, 2021. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 10/21/2021)
2021-11-025Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yurekli, Gokce) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-04MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The defendants shall answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint on or before January 10, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 4, 2021. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 11/04/2021)
2021-11-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/10/2022, (zjch, ) (Entered: 11/05/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar