Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRICHARDSON v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ON BEHALF OF ITS AGENCY, THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02810
Date Filed2021-10-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffJANET L. RICHARDSON
Case DescriptionJanet Richardson submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning the agency's audit of her husband's medical practice. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Richardson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA
on behalf of INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ON BEHALF OF ITS AGENCY, THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-221COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ON BEHALF OF ITS AGENCY, THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8818053) filed by JANET L RICHARDSON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Manos, Marcus) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/25/2021) (adh, ). (Entered: 10/22/2021)
2021-10-25Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/25/2021)
2021-10-252SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/25/2021)
2021-10-253STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/25/2021. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/25/2021)
2021-11-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/01/2021. (Manos, Marcus) (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-015ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 11/1/2021. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 11/22/2021. (Manos, Marcus) Modified on 12/2/2021 (zeg). (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 10/29/2021 (Manos, Marcus) (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-019RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/1/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/1/2021. (zeg) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
2021-11-197NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Steven Schifano on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Schifano, Larry) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2021-11-248Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schifano, Larry) (Entered: 11/24/2021)
2021-11-27MINUTE ORDER granting the Government's 8 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time. The Government shall now respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint on or before January 27, 2022. Further requests for extensions will be disfavored. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/27/2021. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/27/2021)
2021-11-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's response to Plaintiff's Complaint due by 1/27/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-12-02NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 5 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General, was entered in error, incorrect event used. Pleading has been refiled by the Clerk's Office. (zeg) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar