Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSCHNAPF v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02816
Date Filed2021-10-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffLAWRENCE P. SCHNAPF
Case DescriptionLawrence Schnapf, an attorney and professor of law at New York University, submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning two October 2017 letters sent to the Trump administration by NARA pertaining to the release of remaining records under the JFK Act. Schnapf also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged of the request. The agency denied Schnapf's request for expedited processing. Schnapf then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-251COMPLAINT against Lawrence P. Schnapf ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8819274) filed by Lawrence P. Schnapf. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons - NARA, # 3 Summons Summons - AG, # 4 Summons Summons - USAO DC)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 10/25/2021)
2021-10-25Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/25/2021)
2021-10-252SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/25/2021)
2021-10-253NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Prescott Moss on behalf of LAWRENCE P. SCHNAPF (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 10/25/2021)
2021-11-234RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/2/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/2/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - USPS Tracking Info)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar