Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-10-25 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8820898) filed by AMERICAN TRANSPARENCY, D/B/A/ OPENTHEBOOKS.COM. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/25/2021) |
2021-10-25 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN TRANSPARENCY, D/B/A/ OPENTHEBOOKS.COM (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/25/2021) |
2021-10-26 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (znmg) (Entered: 10/26/2021) |
2021-10-26 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 10/26/2021) |
2021-11-02 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/27/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/02/2021) |
2021-11-02 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/02/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/02/2021) |
2021-11-02 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 11/1/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/02/2021) |
2021-11-29 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 11/29/2021) |
2021-11-29 | 8 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 11/29/2021) |
2021-11-29 | 9 | ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before December 13, 2021. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/29/2021. (lcapm2) (Entered: 11/29/2021) |
2021-12-13 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 12/13/2021) |
2021-12-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by February 10, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/14/2021. (Entered: 12/14/2021) |
2022-02-10 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 02/10/2022) |
2022-02-11 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by May 11, 2022, and every 90 days thereafter, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/11/2022. (lcapm2) (Entered: 02/11/2022) |
2022-05-11 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 05/11/2022) |
2022-08-08 | 13 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sean Michael Tepe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Substituting for attorney Diana Valdivia (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 08/08/2022) |
2022-08-10 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN TRANSPARENCY. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 08/10/2022) |
2022-11-09 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 11/09/2022) |
2023-02-07 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN TRANSPARENCY. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 02/07/2023) |
2023-05-08 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 05/08/2023) |
2023-08-07 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 08/07/2023) |
2023-10-23 | 19 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kaitlin Kerry Eckrote on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Substituting for attorney Sean M. Tepe (Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 10/23/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-11-07 | 21 | ORDER entering the briefing schedule proposed in the parties' 20 Joint Status Report. The schedule for further proceedings in this matter is as follows: (1) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before January 26, 2024; (2) Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant's Motion and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before March 11, 2024; (3) Defendant's Reply in Support of Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before April 10, 2024; and (4) Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before April 24, 2024. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/7/23. (lcapm2) (Entered: 11/07/2023) |
2024-01-04 | 22 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 01/04/2024) |
2024-01-05 | 23 | ORDER granting 22 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due by February 23, 2024, Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due by March 25, 2024, Defendant's Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due by April 24, 2024, and Plaintiff's Reply shall be due by May 8, 2024. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/5/24. (lcapm2) (Entered: 01/05/2024) |
2024-01-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 2/23/2024. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment/Cross motions due by 3/25/2024. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment/Response to Cross motions due by 4/24/2024. Reply to Cross Motions due by 5/8/2024. (smc) (Entered: 01/05/2024) |
2024-02-23 | 24 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit Garcia-Malene Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit Freire Declaration, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 02/23/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |