Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02824
Date Filed2021-10-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Secret Service for records concerning incidents of dog bites of Secret Service personnel by President Joe Biden's dogs as well as vaccine and medical records for the dogs. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-251COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8821024) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Homeland Security)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/25/2021)
2021-10-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/25/2021)
2021-10-26Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (znmg) (Entered: 10/26/2021)
2021-10-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 10/26/2021)
2021-10-264STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 26, 2021. (lcbah4) (Entered: 10/26/2021)
2021-11-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/27/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-026RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/02/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-027RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/1/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-298ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Snyder, Hilarie) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar