Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02827
Date Filed2021-10-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Defense Intelligence Agency for records concerning the purchase and utilization of data of individuals within the United States. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-251COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8821339) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Defense)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/25/2021)
2021-10-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/25/2021)
2021-10-26Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/26/2021)
2021-10-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/26/2021)
2021-11-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/27/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/02/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-026RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 11/1/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-027GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 2, 2021. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-298NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-11-299ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-12-01MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before December 29, 2021, the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing further proceedings. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 1, 2021. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
2021-12-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/29/2021. (adh) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar