Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02832
Date Filed2021-10-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffAMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionAmerica First Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the agency's failure to comply with its obligations under the PLO Commitments Compliance Act of 1989. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, America First Legal Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-261COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8823459) filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Mills, Christopher) (Entered: 10/26/2021)
2021-10-27NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to cmills@spero.law, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 2. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-10-27Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (znmg) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-10-272REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Mills, Christopher) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-10-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 10/28/2021)
2021-12-014NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF STATE (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
2021-12-015Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
2021-12-03MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendant's 5 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, it is ORDERED that Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by January 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 3, 2021. (lccjn1) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar