Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02842
Date Filed2021-10-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Securities and Exchange Commission for records concerning the proceeding In the Matter of Entrade, Inc., from January 4, 2006. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-261COMPLAINT against U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8824717) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/26/2021)
2021-10-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/26/2021)
2021-10-26Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/26/2021)
2021-10-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/26/2021)
2021-10-284STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 28, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/28/2021)
2021-11-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/27/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-026RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/02/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-027RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION served on 11/1/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-228NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-249ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2021)
2021-11-29MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before December 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 29, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar