Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02849
Date Filed2021-10-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Transportation Security Administration for records concerning extra protections given to members of Congress on airline flights from Jan. 6 to May 3, 2021. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-271COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8827108) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Homeland Security)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-10-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-10-27Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-10-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-11-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/27/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/02/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-026RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/1/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-197NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Tepe on behalf of All Defendants (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2021-11-238Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-12-01MINUTE ORDER: Granting Consent 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 12/20/21. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/1/21. (DJS) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
2021-12-209ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Saslaw, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2021-12-31MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 2/4/22. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/31/21. (DJS) (Entered: 12/31/2021)
2022-01-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/4/2022. (tb) (Entered: 01/06/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar