Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTOBIAS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02850
Date Filed2021-10-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJIMMY TOBIAS
Case DescriptionReporter Jimmy Tobias submitted FOIA requests to the National Institute of Health for records concerning communications between senior officials concerning EcoHealth. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. Tobias agreed to narrow the scope of some requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Tobias filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantNATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-271COMPLAINT against NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8827125) filed by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-5, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-10-272NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-10-27Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-10-273NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-10-274SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-11-225NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-306Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
2021-11-30MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by January 7, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/30/2021. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar