Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleANTIPOV v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02862
Date Filed2021-10-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffMIKHAIL Y. ANTIPOV Plaintiff
Case DescriptionMichael Antipov, a Swiss citizen, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the agency's decision to bar him from traveling to the United States because had had overstayed his tourist visa as a teenager. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Antipov filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Defendant2255
HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-281COMPLAINT Mikhail Y. Antipov against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8830039) filed by MIKHAIL Y ANTIPOV. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G)(Sinfelt, Meena) Modified on 11/1/2021 to edit docket text (znmg). (Entered: 10/28/2021)
2021-11-01Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (znmg) (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-012SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-243RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General November 9, 2021. (Sinfelt, Meena) (Entered: 11/24/2021)
2021-12-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General November 9, 2021. (Sinfelt, Meena) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
2021-12-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/5/2021 (Sinfelt, Meena) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar