Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNewman v. State of Delaware Division of Public Health
DistrictDistrict of Delaware
CityWilmington
Case Number1:2021cv01546
Date Filed2021-10-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard G. Andrews
PlaintiffShantell Newman
Case DescriptionShantel Newman filed suit against the Delaware Division of Public Health. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantState of Delaware Division of Public Health
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-281MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Shantell Newman. (apk) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/29/2021) (apk). (Entered: 10/28/2021)
2021-10-282COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against State of Delaware Division of Public Health - filed by Shantell Newman. (Attachments: # 1 Acknowledgement of Consent Form, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 10/28/2021)
2021-10-283Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 10/28/2021)
2021-10-29CORRECTING ENTRY: Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis at D.I. 1 replaced to reflect redacted filing. (apk) (Entered: 10/29/2021)
2021-11-03Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms) (Entered: 11/03/2021)
2021-11-034ORDER Granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/3/2021. (nms) (Entered: 11/03/2021)
2021-11-195Return of Undeliverable Mail, D.I. 4 , sent to Shantell D. Newman. Resent to Address Updated on 11/16/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01509-RGA, 1:21-cv-01546-RGA(srs) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar