Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02878
Date Filed2021-11-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES
Case DescriptionEnergy Policy Advocates submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the ethics clearances and recusal process for Special Presidential Envoy John Kerry. EPA also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but told EPA that it fell within the definition of unusual circumstances and take further to process. EPA then submitted a second FOIA request for records concerning the meaning of unusual circumstances. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request as well but after hearing nothing further from the agency EPA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-011COMPLAINT against STATE DEPARTMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8835126) filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Proposed to USAO, AG, and State Dept., # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-02Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/03/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar