Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRichard R. Lawless v. The Central Intelligence Agency
DistrictCentral District of California
CityEastern Division - Riverside
Case Number5:2021cv01857
Date Filed2021-11-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jesus G. Bernal
PlaintiffRichard R. Lawless
Case DescriptionRichard Lawless submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning transcripts of surveillance by the agency in Puerto Rico. The agency acknowledged receipt of the but denied the request by citing executive privilege. Lawless filed an administrative appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Lawless filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantThe Central Intelligence Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-021COMPLAINT against Defendant The Central Intelligence Agency. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym., filed by plaintiff Richard R. Lawless. (Attachments: # 1 CV-71) (ghap) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-022APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed by plaintiff Richard R. Lawless. (ghap) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-023NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-024NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-025Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-036ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. Granting 2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (es) (Entered: 11/04/2021)
2021-11-10760 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 as to Defendant The Central Intelligence Agency. (twdb) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-158STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar