Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUS INVENTOR, INC. v. UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02894
Date Filed2021-11-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffUS INVENTOR, INC.
Case DescriptionU.S. Inventor, Inc. v. U.S. Patent and Trademark Office for records concerning the delegation of authority for patent judges. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, U.S. Inventor, Inc. filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-021COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8840211) filed by US INVENTOR, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Medich, Brian) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-032MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William W. Flachsbart, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8842848. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by US INVENTOR, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Medich, Brian) (Entered: 11/03/2021)
2021-11-04Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (znmg) (Entered: 11/04/2021)
2021-11-04NOTICE OF ERROR re 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; emailed to bmedich@dbllawyers.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. The Declaration must have an original, wet signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)
2021-11-043SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 11/04/2021)
2021-11-044ERRATA Signed Declaration by US INVENTOR, INC. re 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William W. Flachsbart, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8842848. Fee Status: Fee Paid. filed by US INVENTOR, INC.. (Medich, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2021)
2021-11-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE served on 11/5/2021 (Medich, Brian) (Entered: 11/09/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar