Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02914
Date Filed2021-11-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffCENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES
Case DescriptionThe Center for Immigration Studies submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the ten leading nations or origin for self-petitioning spouses among the arrivals in the last five years for which data exists. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CIS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-041COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8846626) filed by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney, # 3 Summons for Attorney General, # 4 Summons for Defendant)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 11/04/2021)
2021-11-08Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (znmg) (Entered: 11/08/2021)
2021-11-082SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 11/08/2021)
2021-11-163RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/15/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/15/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
2021-11-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/15/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
2021-11-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 11/15/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar