Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-11-05 | 1 | COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8847691) filed by GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC, GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 FOIA to ATF, # 2 ATF Response, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) Modified on 11/18/2021 (znmw). (Entered: 11/05/2021) |
2021-11-08 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 11/08/2021) |
2021-11-08 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/08/2021) |
2021-11-09 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Jeffrey Olson on behalf of GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC (Olson, Robert) (Entered: 11/09/2021) |
2021-12-16 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of All Defendants (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 12/16/2021) |
2021-12-16 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES.(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 12/16/2021) |
2021-12-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before January 14, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/17/2021. (lcabj1) (Entered: 12/17/2021) |
2021-12-17 | 6 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. (Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 12/17/2021) |
2021-12-17 | 7 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, INC. (Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 12/17/2021) |
2022-01-14 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2022) |
2022-01-18 | | MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the joint status report 8 , it is ORDERED that the parties submit another joint status report by March 15, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/18/2022. (lcabj1) (Entered: 01/18/2022) |
2022-03-15 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 03/15/2022) |
2022-03-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the most recent status report 9 , it is ORDERED that the parties submit another joint status report by May 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/16/2022. (lcabj1) (Entered: 03/16/2022) |
2022-04-08 | 10 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sean Michael Tepe on behalf of BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES Substituting for attorney Christopher Hair (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 04/08/2022) |
2022-05-16 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 05/16/2022) |
2022-05-24 | | MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the recent status report 11 , it is ORDERED that the parties submit another joint status report by July 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/24/22. (DMK) (Entered: 05/24/2022) |
2022-07-15 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 07/15/2022) |
2022-07-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the most recent status report 12 , it is ORDERED that the parties submit another joint status report by September 13, 2022. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/15/2022. (lcabj1) (Entered: 07/15/2022) |
2022-09-13 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 09/13/2022) |
2022-09-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the most recent status report 13 , it is ORDERED that the parties submit another joint status report by November 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/2022. (lcabj1) (Entered: 09/14/2022) |
2022-11-14 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 11/14/2022) |
2022-11-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the most recent status report 14 , it is ORDERED that the parties submit another joint status report by January 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/16/2022. (lcabj1) (Entered: 11/16/2022) |
2023-01-13 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 01/13/2023) |
2023-02-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the most recent status report 15 , it is ORDERED that the parties submit another joint status report by March 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/1/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 02/01/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the most recent status report 16 , it is ORDERED that the parties submit another joint status report by May 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/14/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-05-15 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 05/15/2023) |
2023-05-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the most recent status report 17 , it is ORDERED that the parties submit another joint status report by July 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/16/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 05/16/2023) |
2023-07-14 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 07/14/2023) |
2023-07-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the most recent status report 18 , it is ORDERED that the parties submit another joint status report by September 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/17/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 07/17/2023) |
2023-09-12 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 09/12/2023) |
2023-09-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the most recent status report 19 , it is ORDERED that the parties submit another joint status report by November 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/13/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 09/13/2023) |
2023-09-13 | 20 | MOTION for Protective Order Expedited Motion for Protective Order by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Attachments: # 1 Barnett Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 09/13/2023) |
2023-09-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff must file any opposition to defendant's Motion for Protective Order 20 by Tuesday, September 19, 2023. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 09/14/2023) |
2023-09-14 | 21 | NOTICE of Appearance by George L. Lyon, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lyon, George) (Entered: 09/14/2023) |
2023-09-15 | 22 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, INC., GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Lyon, George) (Entered: 09/15/2023) |
2023-09-15 | 23 | Memorandum in opposition to re 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 09/15/2023) |
2023-09-16 | 24 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, INC., GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.. (Lyon, George) (Entered: 09/16/2023) |
2023-09-18 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court has considered defendant's motion for a protective order 20 , its request for expedition 20 , plaintiff's request for additional time to respond 22 , defendant's opposition 23 , and the reply 24 , as well as the representations contained in plaintiff's motion concerning how it plans to treat the records covered by the motion while the matter is under advisement. In an effort to balance and accommodate both the circumstances that prompted the request for the protective order as well as plaintiff's counsel's legitimate need for additional time, it is hereby ORDERED in the Court's discretion that plaintiff must file its response by October 13, 2023, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that pending resolution of the motion for protective order, plaintiff must sequester the FOIA records that were inadvertently produced on September 6, 2023, and that it shall not disseminate, disclose, or use those records or their contents for any purpose pending the Court's ruling on the 20 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/18/2023.(lcabj1) (Entered: 09/18/2023) |
2023-09-29 | 25 | MOTION to Clarify re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,, by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, INC., GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Emails between counsel)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 09/29/2023) |
2023-10-04 | 26 | RESPONSE re 25 MOTION to Clarify re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,, filed by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-05 | 27 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 25 MOTION to Clarify re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,, filed by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, INC., GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.. (Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 10/05/2023) |
2023-10-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 25 motion to clarify, 26 opposition, and 27 reply, the 25 motion to clarify is DENIED. There was nothing unclear about the Court's September 18, 2023 minute order that "pending resolution of the motion for protective order, plaintiff must sequester the FOIA records that were inadvertently produced on September 6, 2023, and that it shall not disseminate, disclose, or use those records or their contents for any purpose." Plaintiffs appear to be asking the Court not to "clarify" the minute order, but to revise it, to permit plaintiffs to review and possibly use the unredacted records in connection with their response to the motion for protective order 20 . This should not be necessary, and it is not consistent with the clear directive from this Court that the inadvertently produced records be "sequestered" until the matter is resolved. The Court also notes that both parties appear to be using the motion for clarification as a means to remind the Court of their positions on the pending motion for a protective order, and that is not a good use of the parties' resources or the Court's time. Plaintiffs' motion for clarification is unnecessarily lengthy and contentious, as it includes a number of factual representations that do not bear on the very limited issue for which they claim they are seeking clarification, and defendants are similarly under the misimpression that aggressive and repetitive pleadings are more persuasive. The Court assures both parties that they are not. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/5/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 10/05/2023) |
2023-10-13 | 28 | Memorandum in opposition to re 20 Motion for Protective Order filed by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, INC., GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Dec of Aidan Johnston)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 10/13/2023) |
2023-10-20 | 29 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 20 MOTION for Protective Order Expedited Motion for Protective Order filed by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 10/20/2023) |
2023-10-30 | 30 | ORDER granting 20 Motion for Protective Order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/30/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 10/30/2023) |
2023-11-14 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 11/14/2023) |
2023-11-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. The November 14, 2023 joint status report 31 reveals that while there is little in dispute with respect to the merits of this FOIA action, the parties are still at odds over the unredacted material that was inadvertently produced to the plaintiffs on September 6, 2023 in the defendant's 13th production of records. The Protective Order 30 bars the use or dissemination of this material unless and until the Court determines that the portions of the documents defendant maintains should have been redacted are not properly covered by an exemption and should be disclosed. Plaintiffs state that they are not challenging the withholdings in this case, but at the same time, they are still seeking access to the documents that are subject to the Protective Order. Given the Court's ruling that the Protective Order is to remain in place unless the Court finds that the exemptions were not properly invoked, in its view, the only course of action is to ORDER that the defendant must file its motion for summary judgment with respect to both the validity of the withholdings being invoked in connection with the material and the public domain issue with respect to those documents by December 8, 2023; any opposition and cross-motion, if any, to be supported by a single memorandum of points and authorities, is due December 22, 2023; the reply, and cross-opposition, if necessary, to be supported by a single memorandum, is due January 12, 2024; and the cross-reply, if necessary, is due January 19, 2024. If plaintiffs do not, as they report in the status report, dispute the applicability of the exemptions involved, they can say so in the opposition and simply address the public domain issue. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/16/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 11/16/2023) |
2023-12-08 | 32 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 2d Barnett Declaration, # 4 Seidel Declaration)(Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 12/08/2023) |
2023-12-20 | 33 | RESPONSE re 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, INC., GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Response to Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 12/20/2023) |
2024-01-12 | 34 | RESPONSE re 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 01/12/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |
|