Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleASHLEY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02923
Date Filed2021-11-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJONATHAN ASHLEY
Case DescriptionJonathan Ashley, a law librarian at the University of Virginia Law School, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning DOJ's list of deferred and non-prosecution agreements that were mentioned in a 209 GAO report. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Ashley also submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records concerning five non-prosecution agreements. The agency acknowledged of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Ashley filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-11-051COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8848310) filed by JONATHAN ASHLEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons Agency Summons, # 7 Summons AG Summons, # 8 Summons USAO Summons)(Rottman, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/05/2021)
2021-11-08Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (znmg) (Entered: 11/08/2021)
2021-11-082SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 11/08/2021)
2021-11-173NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Liu on behalf of JONATHAN ASHLEY (Liu, Wendy) (Entered: 11/17/2021)
2021-11-224RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/12/2021 (Rottman, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-225RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/12/2021. (Rottman, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/12/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/12/2021. (Rottman, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar