Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHOLMES-HAMILTON et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02927
Date Filed2021-11-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffDAJUAN HOLMES-HAMILTON
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH WILLIAMS
Plaintiff
WILLIAM COX
Case DescriptionDajuan Holmes-Hamilton, Jeremiah Williams, and William Cox submitted two FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning the investigation of the deaths of Cynthia Ann Day and Nathaniel Edward Holmes in the Dominican Republic. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). The requesters filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the requesters filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-191COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9171273.), filed by Dajuan Holmes-Hamilton, Jeremiah Williams, William Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet, # 14 Summons)(Szokoly, Nicholas) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/10/2021.] (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-192QC NOTICE: 1 Complaint, filed by William Cox, Dajuan Holmes-Hamilton, Jeremiah Williams was filed incompletely. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. Summons were provided for only the named Defendant. If the defendant is either an agency of the United States or an officer or employee of the United States, you must serve both the U.S. Attorney General and the U.S. Attorney for the District of Maryland, as well as each defendant. To correct this problem, file the other Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link the Summons to 1 . (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/10/2021.] (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-193NOTICE by William Cox, Dajuan Holmes-Hamilton, Jeremiah Williams re 1 Complaint, U.S. Attorney General and the U.S. Attorney for the District of Maryland (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Szokoly, Nicholas) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/10/2021.] (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-224Summons Issued 60 days as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/10/2021.] (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-04-145SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dajuan Holmes-Hamilton, Jeremiah Williams, William Cox. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 3/31/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Szokoly, Nicholas) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/10/2021.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)
2021-04-146SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dajuan Holmes-Hamilton, Jeremiah Williams, William Cox. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Szokoly, Nicholas) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/10/2021.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)
2021-04-147SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dajuan Holmes-Hamilton, Jeremiah Williams, William Cox. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 3/30/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Szokoly, Nicholas) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/10/2021.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)
2021-06-018MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Federal Bureau of Investigation(Farber, Molissa) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/01/2021)
2021-06-149RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by William Cox, Dajuan Holmes-Hamilton, Jeremiah Williams.(Szokoly, Nicholas) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/14/2021)
2021-06-2110REPLY in Response re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Farber, Molissa) Modified on 6/22/2021 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from Maryland on 11/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/21/2021)
2021-11-0511MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 11/5/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/10/2021.] (Entered: 11/05/2021)
2021-11-0512ORDER granting 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue; transferring this case to the USDC for the District of Columbia for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 11/5/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 11/10/2021.] (Entered: 11/05/2021)
2021-11-1013Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:21-cv-00702. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-1014STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/10/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-10MINUTE ORDER. The government shall respond to Plaintiffs' 1 Complaint on or before December 10, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/10/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's response due by 12/10/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar